Global Patent Index - EP 0726613 B1

EP 0726613 B1 2000-03-01 - Preform material and manufacturing process of preform material and semi-finished products for electrical contacts

Title (en)

Preform material and manufacturing process of preform material and semi-finished products for electrical contacts

Title (de)

Vormaterial und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Vormaterial und Halbzeug für elektrische Kontakte

Title (fr)

Ebauche et procédé pour la fabrication d'ébauches et de produits semi-finis pour des contacts électriques

Publication

EP 0726613 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95114277 A

Priority

DE 19504144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0726613A2] The blank is made into electrical contacts by connecting it to a contact carrier strip, esp. of copper, using resistive heating. The blank is formed as a metal strip (1) with a contact region and a coating of material on its underside which is to be connected to the carrier strip. The coating material essentially consists of silver, whose melting point lies below that of the metal strip. The coating is applied at least at the tip of a strand-like protrusion (5) on the underside (4) of the metal strip. The core (2) of the metal strip is essentially made of nickel. It can be a copper-nickel alloy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/02; H01H 11/04; H01R 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/02 (2006.01); H01R 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/0214 (2013.01); H01R 4/029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0726613 A2 19960814; EP 0726613 A3 19970910; EP 0726613 B1 20000301; DE 19504144 A1 19960822; DE 19504144 C2 19980924; US 5883352 A 19990316

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Free text: 20021124

2003-05-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021124

2002-09-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020909

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020907

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020904

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AMI DODUCO GMBH

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507911 20000406

2000-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: W.C. HERAEUS GMBH & CO. KG

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980824

1997-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950927

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT