Global Patent Index - EP 0726619 B1

EP 0726619 B1 2000-03-29 - Electrical connector having a contact locking piece and a sliding cam

Title (en)

Electrical connector having a contact locking piece and a sliding cam

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder mit Kontaktverriegelungsteil und verschiebbarem Nocken

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique à grille de verouillage de contacts et tiroir

Publication

EP 0726619 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400259 A

Priority

FR 9501576 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0726619A1] The connector includes a plug (12) which comprises a box (22) and a grid fitted into it to lock the contacts in passages parallel to the direction of insertion. The base (10) also has a box enclosing the cavity into which the plug is inserted and a slider (14) movable in a transverse direction. The grid presents lugs (44) acting as an abutment for the slider and to stop the insertion of the plug before the studs (28) on the longer sides of the box enter sloping passages (30) in the flanks of the slider.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629; H01R 13/436

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4365 (2013.01); H01R 13/62911 (2013.01); H01R 13/62927 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0726619 A1 19960814; EP 0726619 B1 20000329; DE 69607404 D1 20000504; DE 69607404 T2 20000907; FR 2730585 A1 19960814; FR 2730585 B1 19970425; US 5618195 A 19970408

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69607404

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI AUTOMOTIVE HOLDING, GUYANCOURT, FR

- Document: DE 69607404

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-12-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141106

2014-11-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, GUYANCOURT, FR

- Document: DE 69607404

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120628

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DELPHI INTERNATIONAL OPERATIONS LUXEMBOURG S.A, LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL, COURBEVOIE, FR

- Document: DE 69607404

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69607404

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607404 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE