Global Patent Index - EP 0726791 B1

EP 0726791 B1 2000-06-21 - IMPLANTABLE TISSUE STIMULATOR

Title (en)

IMPLANTABLE TISSUE STIMULATOR

Title (de)

IMPLANTIERBARES GEWEBEREIZUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

STIMULATEUR TISSULAIRE IMPLANTABLE

Publication

EP 0726791 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92917047 A

Priority

  • US 9206207 W
  • US 73880191 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5222494A] Apparatus is disclosed for stabilizing the value of a parameter of the output pulses of a tissue stimulator, such as the magnitude of the current or the charge delivered in each output pulse to excite the cell membranes of the tissue to be stimulated. The apparatus measures the value of this parameter against target limits, and if either limit is exceeded, adjusts the value of a second parameter of the output pulses, such as voltage level or pulse width, to stabilize the value of the first parameter. The value of the first parameter may be measured by sampling thereof at a rate considerably less than the frequency of the output pulses, and the value of the second parameter then adjusted to bring the value of the first parameter within the target limits. Both current and charge stabilization modes of the pulse generating stimulator for efficient excitation of cell membranes of the selected tissue are described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61N 1/18; A61N 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/08 (2006.01); A61N 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/36128 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9302740 A1 19930218; AU 2394592 A 19930302; DE 69231191 D1 20000727; DE 69231191 T2 20010322; EP 0726791 A1 19960821; EP 0726791 A4 19960219; EP 0726791 B1 20000621; US 5222494 A 19930629

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69231191

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090717

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-08-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-07-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030703

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ST. DR. CAVATTONI ING. A. RAIMONDI

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69231191 20000727

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CYBERONICS, INC.

1999-08-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IMPLANTABLE TISSUE STIMULATOR

1997-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970227

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940222

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1996-02-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1996-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE