Global Patent Index - EP 0726818 B1

EP 0726818 B1 2000-05-17 - SCREENING APPARATUS

Title (en)

SCREENING APPARATUS

Title (de)

SIEBEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE TAMISAGE

Publication

EP 0726818 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94931644 A

Priority

  • GB 9402408 W
  • GB 9322811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9512462A1] A screening apparatus (1) for screening particulate material and comprising: a base frame (11); an elevating conveyor (12); a conveyor carrying frame (13) adjustably mounted on the base frame (11) and arranged so as to be capable of moving the conveyor (12) generally lengthwise in order to adjust the position of an upper end (16) of the end (16) of the conveyor; a sub-frame (18) pivotally adjustably mounted on the base frame (11) via a pivot (20) and carrying a vibratory screen (17) arranged to receive material falling under gravity from the upper discharge end (16) of the conveyor (12), said sub-frame being adjustable about said pivot in order to adjust the attitude of the screen; discharge means (23) for discharging separate screened portions of the material; and a linkage (19, 22) between the sub-frame (18) and the carrying frame (13) which includes a direct pivotal connection (20) between the sub-frame and the carrying frame whereby there is simultaneous lengthwise adjustment of the sub-frame; in which the elevating conveyor (12) and the conveyor carrying frame (13) comprise a main portion (12a, 13a) extending from a loading station (14), and an upper end portion (12b, 13b) which includes the discharge end (16) of the conveyor, said portions being hingedly connected together to allow the apparatus to be converted between an operative mode in which the end portion forms a prolongation of the main portion, and a transport mode in which the end is pivoted downwardly relative to the main portion thereby to reduce the transport height of the discharge end of the conveyor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 13/16; B07B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/11 (2006.01); B07B 1/00 (2006.01); B07B 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/16 (2013.01); B07B 1/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9512462 A1 19950511; DE 69424561 D1 20000621; DE 69424561 T2 20010118; EP 0726818 A1 19960821; EP 0726818 B1 20000517; GB 9322811 D0 19931222; JP H09511433 A 19971118

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141101

2014-11-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69424561

2014-11-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69424561

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-08-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424561 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1997-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970717

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960517

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB