Global patent index - EP 0726835 B1

EP 0726835 B1 2001-04-11 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REDUCING THE EFFECTIVE CUTTING SURFACE OF A CUTTING MACHINE

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REDUCING THE EFFECTIVE CUTTING SURFACE OF A CUTTING MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERMINDERN DER NUTZOBERFLÄCHE EINER ZUSCHNEIDMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR REDUIRE LA SURFACE UTILE DE COUPE DANS UNE MACHINE DE DECOUPE

Publication

EP 0726835 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93919383 A

Priority

  • FR 9300808 W
  • FR 9210454 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5709023A] PCT No. PCT/FR93/00808 Sec. 371 Date Apr. 20, 1995 Sec. 102(e) Date Apr. 20, 1995 PCT Filed Aug. 12, 1993 PCT Pub. No. WO94/05471 PCT Pub. Date Mar. 17, 1994The invention provides apparatus for reducing the working area for cutting on a cutting machine The apparatus comprises the cutting machine made up of a cutting table, the working area on the surface of the cutting table, an automatic cutting tool for cutting a stack of sheet material within the working area and a suction apparatus providing suction to the working area. An air-impervious film covers the stack and which holds the stack down within the working area when suction is applied. An air-impervious removable mask (6) covers a portion of the working area and is held in a determined position by fixing and positioning structures, such as a strip and an abutment attached to the mask. When the mask is held in the determined position, the working area is effectively reduced to a portion of the working area that is not covered by the mask.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/01; A41H 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/018 (2013.01); Y10S 83/941 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49998 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0476 (2015.04); Y10T 83/748 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5709023 A 19980120; DE 69330141 D1 20010517; DE 69330141 T2 20010816; EP 0726835 A1 19960821; EP 0726835 B1 20010411; ES 2157928 T3 20010901; FR 2695058 A1 19940304; FR 2695058 B1 19941216; WO 9405471 A1 19940317

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120813

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69330141

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120812

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120812

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120812

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-07-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157928

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69330141

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1997-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961213

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950217

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT