Global Patent Index - EP 0726848 B1

EP 0726848 B1 2000-03-22 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING A CUTTING STICK FOR A CUTTING CYLINDER OF A ROTARY PRESS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING A CUTTING STICK FOR A CUTTING CYLINDER OF A ROTARY PRESS

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM VERSTELLEN EINER SCHNEIDMESSERLEISTE FÜR EINEN SCHNEIDZYLINDER EINER ROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE REGLAGE D'UNE REGLE DE COUPE POUR UN CYLINDRE DE COUPE D'UNE PRESSE ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 0726848 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94902604 A

Priority

  • DE 9301210 W
  • DE 4242886 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4244787A1] A device for displacing cutting-knife strips on a cutting cylinder for the transverse cutting of a paper web stream for non-collect production and collect production is intended to be of compact design and simple to operate. This is achieved in that the cutting-knife strips have, on their bottom surface, slots extending at an acute angle, in which studs engage which are in turn movable in the axial direction by means of a drive, with the result that the cutting-knife strips move in the peripheral direction on the cutting cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/60; B65H 45/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/40 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B41F 13/60 (2006.01); B65H 35/08 (2006.01); B65H 45/16 (2006.01); B65H 45/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/168 (2013.01); B26D 7/2628 (2013.01); B41F 13/60 (2013.01); B65H 35/08 (2013.01); B65H 45/28 (2013.01); B65H 2301/16 (2013.01); B65H 2511/11 (2013.01); B65H 2511/414 (2013.01); B65H 2555/11 (2013.01); Y10T 83/9399 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9469 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9471 (2015.04)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/414 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4244787 A1 19950223; DE 4244787 C2 20000127; DE 4242886 A1 19940623; DE 4244786 A1 19950223; DE 4244786 C2 19970807; DE 59309989 D1 20000427; EP 0726848 A1 19960821; EP 0726848 B1 20000322; JP 3391793 B2 20030331; JP H08504684 A 19960521; US 5950516 A 19990914; WO 9414612 A2 19940707; WO 9414612 A3 19941027

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2002-12-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-08-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001217

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001217

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59309989 20000427

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1996-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960827

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950609

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE