Global Patent Index - EP 0726872 B1

EP 0726872 B1 2000-02-02 - OUTER-BOOM CRANE

Title (en)

OUTER-BOOM CRANE

Title (de)

KRAN MIT ENDAUSLEGER

Title (fr)

GRUE A FLECHE EXTERIEURE

Publication

EP 0726872 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93916360 A

Priority

  • SE 9300622 W
  • SE 9202279 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9403389A1] An outer-boom crane comprising a first boom section (1) and an outer boom (2) which is pivotable relative to the first boom section by means of a hydraulic cylinder (12) whose one end is connected to the first boom section by a first articulation (13) and whose opposite end is connected to the outer boom (2) by a second articulation (14). Between the two booms (1, 2), there is provided at least one link device (15) which is connected to the first boom section by a third articulation (16) and to the outer boom (2) by a fourth articulation (17) which is spaced from the second articulation (14) and from the third articulation (16), more specifically with the third articulation (16) located at a greater distance from the fourth articulation (17) than the second articulation (14). By means of the link device (15), the outer boom (2) can switch articulation points so as to pivot, within its working range, about a fourth articulation (17) which is situated at a great distance from the main articulation (3) of the first boom section while, when pivoting towards and away from its parking position on the upper side of the first boom section, it is pivoted about the third articulation (16) which is situated considerably closer to the main articulation (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/68; B66C 23/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/26 (2006.01); B66C 23/42 (2006.01); B66C 23/68 (2006.01); B66C 23/70 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B66C (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9403389 A1 19940217; AT 189445 T 20000215; AU 4594293 A 19940303; DE 69327807 D1 20000309; DE 69327807 T2 20001012; EP 0726872 A1 19960821; EP 0726872 B1 20000202; ES 2142875 T3 20000501; FI 108026 B 20011115; FI 950494 A0 19950203; FI 950494 A 19950203; JP 3074022 B2 20000807; JP H07509682 A 19951026; KR 0181569 B1 19990415; SE 470437 B 19940307; SE 9202279 D0 19920804; SE 9202279 L 19940205

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050709

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2005-07-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-07-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050708

2004-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-07 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040707

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142875 T3

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69327807 20000309

2000-02-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189445 T 20000215

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JONSERED CRANES AB

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980216

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941118

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT