Global Patent Index - EP 0727154 B1

EP 0727154 B1 2001-05-16 - Apparatus and method for removing long fibrous foreign materials from tobacco

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for removing long fibrous foreign materials from tobacco

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Entfernen von langfaserigen Fremdstoffen aus Tabak

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour enlever des corps étrangers à longues fibres du tabac

Publication

EP 0727154 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102288 A

Priority

DE 19505259 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727154A2] Four to eight parallel adjacent rollers (5) with an OD of 150 to 300 mm have a number of radially outward pointing needles (7) on their outer periphery. The rollers rotate in the same direction. The needles are the same length of between 5 and 30 mm and are spaced apart by 1.5 to 15 mm. A gap of 0 to 80 mm lies between the points of the needles of two adjacent rollers. The rollers are positioned in a housing (4) open at the top, with their axes lying in the same plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24B 1/04; A24B 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24B 1/04 (2006.01); A24B 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24B 1/04 (2013.01); A24B 3/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727154 A2 19960821; EP 0727154 A3 19981125; EP 0727154 B1 20010516; DE 19505259 A1 19960822

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606889

- Effective date: 20110901

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070215

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060215

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060215

2005-02-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050201

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2003-02-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606889 20010621

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-05-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991206

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981103

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI