Global Patent Index - EP 0727171 B1

EP 0727171 B1 2001-01-24 - Device for floor treating machines

Title (en)

Device for floor treating machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für Bodenpflegegeräte

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appareils d'entretien de sols

Publication

EP 0727171 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117890 A

Priority

DE 19505106 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727171A2] The floor cleaner has a brush roller (6) with its motor (8) and toothed belt drive (7) which is installed in an adjustable inner part (4) of the housing (1) where a vacuum space (5) is formed. The entire inner part is pivotable about an axis (10) and its trailing end is held up by a tension spring (11). The vacuum space is sealed at its leading end by a forward moulding (13). A rearward moulding (14) directly beneath the pivot axis is convex so that the suction is maintained irrespective of the pivoting of the brush roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/0411 (2013.01); A47L 9/0444 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727171 A2 19960821; EP 0727171 A3 19980722; EP 0727171 B1 20010124; CA 2169591 A1 19960817; CA 2169591 C 20040113; DE 19505106 A1 19960822; DE 19505106 C2 19970417; US 5819370 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508991

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121114

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101101

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508991 20010301

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990806

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980703

1998-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB