Global patent index - EP 0727173 B1

EP 0727173 B1 2000-11-02 - Vacuum cleaner hose with handle

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner hose with handle

Title (de)

Staubsaugerschlauch mit einem Griffstück

Title (fr)

Tuyau pour aspirateur muni d'une poignée

Publication

EP 0727173 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100440 A

Priority

DE 29502725 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727173A1] The handgrip (1) is assembled from wo half-shells (3) held together and secured to the hose (2) by a bayonet closure ring (5). The half-shells form a surround (6) for a one-piece tubular air duct (7) and a handle (8) with a hole (9) for the operator's fingers. A rotary electrical coupling is formed by sliding contacts (12) in one half-shell co-operating with slip-rings (10) on a bushing (11). Electric conductor links (17) and manually operated switches (14) are mounted at the transition between the handle and a projecting coupling section (15) of the air duct.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/32; A47L 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/28 (2006.01); A47L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/2889 (2013.01); A47L 9/2857 (2013.01); A47L 9/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29502725 U1 19960613; EP 0727173 A1 19960821; EP 0727173 B1 20001102

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050113

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-02-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606063

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-07

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980813

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970121

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT