Global Patent Index - EP 0727176 B1

EP 0727176 B1 2000-01-26 - Revolving sprinkling assembly for dishwashers, provided with horizontal reciprocating motion

Title (en)

Revolving sprinkling assembly for dishwashers, provided with horizontal reciprocating motion

Title (de)

Drehende Sprüheinrichtung für Geschirrspülmaschine mit horizontaler hin- und -hergehender Bewegung

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'arrosage tournant pour lave vaisselle avec mouvement horizontal alterné

Publication

EP 0727176 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96830066 A

Priority

IT MI950273 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727176A2] A revolving sprinkling assembly for dishwashers includes a sprinkler (5) provided with at least one propulsion nozzle (6) and centrally pivoted on a vertical shaft (3) located at one end of a support arm (2) which in turn is vertically pivoted at the other end to a feed duct (1) integral with the washing space. The support arm (2) is also provided at the free end with a horizontal roller (8) resting in the center of a transverse guide (11) fixed to the walls of the washing space, said guide (11) having a central lowering whose sides are the stops for limiting the horizontal travel of the arm (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/20 (2013.01); A47L 15/23 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727176 A2 19960821; EP 0727176 A3 19961218; EP 0727176 B1 20000126; DE 69606334 D1 20000302; DE 69606334 T2 20000727; ES 2143167 T3 20000501; IT 1275155 B 19970730; IT MI950273 A1 19960815; IT MI950273 D0 19950215

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050214

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050212

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050214

2005-02-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050214

2005-02-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050213

2004-02-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143167 T3

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606334 20000302

2000-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990113

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970205

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE