Global Patent Index - EP 0727181 B1

EP 0727181 B1 2000-03-22 - A dishwasher for embedding with an electro-mechanical programmer operated from the front

Title (en)

A dishwasher for embedding with an electro-mechanical programmer operated from the front

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine mit einer elektromechanischen Programmiereinrichtung zum Bedienen von der Frontseite

Title (fr)

Machine à laver la vaisselle avec programmateur électromécanique à programmer sur la partie frontale

Publication

EP 0727181 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96200013 A

Priority

IT MI950099 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727181A2] A dishwasher for embedding has an electro-mechanical programmer (7) fitted in the loading door (1) and a disc-shaped knob (9) for operating the programmer (7) housed inside the door (1) and accessible for manual operation through a hole (10) formed in the front wall of the door (1) and exposing a sector of a circular peripheral ring of the knob, a cylindrical rim (12) associated with the knob (9) and having programme indicators being partially visible through a window (13) in the upper edge of the door when the door is half open. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 15/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4293 (2013.01); A47L 15/4257 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727181 A2 19960821; EP 0727181 A3 19970129; EP 0727181 B1 20000322; DE 69607227 D1 20000427; DE 69607227 T2 20001221; IT 236665 Y1 20000817; IT MI950099 U1 19960816; IT MI950099 V0 19950216

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070104

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060104

2005-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607227 20000427

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980625

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970213

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT