Global patent index - EP 0727314 B1

EP 0727314 B1 2001-01-24 - Ink supply unit

Title (en)

Ink supply unit

Title (de)

Tintenzufuhrvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation en encre

Publication

EP 0727314 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96102362 A

Priority

JP 2901095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727314A2] A main ink chamber 2 for housing a capillary member 3 and an intermediate ink chamber 4 are provided, between which a first meniscus formation member 8 is disposed. An ink guide member 9 is in contact with the bottom face of the first meniscus formation member 8 for supplying ink to the first meniscus formation member 8. The ink guide member 9 is held by ink guide member retainers 13 extending toward the ink guide member 9 from the wall of a communication hole 7 and is kept in contact with the first meniscus formation member 8. A larger number of the ink guide member retainers 13 are placed on the side of a joint port 11 and a smaller number thereof are placed on the side of the intermediate ink chamber 4 for guiding bubbles entering from the first meniscus formation member 8 to the side of the intermediate ink chamber 8 for preventing a move of the bubbles to the joint port 11 and the mixing of the bubbles into a print head. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/19; B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/19 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/1752 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727314 A2 19960821; EP 0727314 A3 19980311; EP 0727314 B1 20010124; DE 69611628 D1 20010301; DE 69611628 T2 20010712; JP 2817653 B2 19981030; JP H08216424 A 19960827; TW 286355 B 19960921

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140216

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69611628

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140216

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69611628

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611628

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-01

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990811

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980824

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB