EP 0727315 A3 19970409 - Letter printing method for a packaging machine
Title (en)
Letter printing method for a packaging machine
Title (de)
Verfahren zum Buchstabendruck für eine Verpackungsmaschine
Title (fr)
Méthode d'impression de lettres pour une machine d'emballage
Publication
Application
Priority
JP 6849395 A 19950220
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0727315A2] There is provided a simply applicable printing method for a letter printing on a film in a packaging machine which makes sealing as it changes transfer velocities of a letter printing object. A transfer velocity of a packaging film (8) is detected by a rotary encoder (7). A carbon tape (2) unwound from a carbon tape roll (1) and the packaging film (8) are placed between a head supporting platen roller (6) and a line thermal head (5) and a necessary printing is made on the packaging film (8). An electric supply to the thermal head (5) is controlled synchronously with the transfer or moving velocity of the packaging film (8) detected by the rotary encoder (7). <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B65B 61/26 (2006.01); B41J 2/325 (2006.01); B65C 9/46 (2006.01); B65C 11/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B41J 2/325 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] DE 3743698 A1 19890706 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- [Y] EP 0575773 A1 19931229 - ESSELTE METO INT GMBH [DE]
- [Y] US 3813677 A 19740528 - SHIMOTSUMA W
- [A] US 5355152 A 19941011 - PORTER LORRAINE T [US], et al
- [A] US 4679053 A 19870707 - KATSURAI JUNJI [JP], et al
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 95, no. 3 28 April 1995 (1995-04-28)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 426 (P - 1784) 9 August 1994 (1994-08-09)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 139 (M - 387) 14 June 1985 (1985-06-14)
- [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 95, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0727315 A2 19960821; EP 0727315 A3 19970409; EP 0727315 B1 20020123; DE 69618683 D1 20020314; DE 69618683 T2 20021114; DE 69618683 T9 20061207; JP 3720410 B2 20051130; JP H08217039 A 19960827
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 96102208 A 19960214; DE 69618683 T 19960214; JP 6849395 A 19950220