Global Patent Index - EP 0727338 B1

EP 0727338 B1 2002-09-18 - Railway transport unit for the mixed transport of containers and swap bodies

Title (en)

Railway transport unit for the mixed transport of containers and swap bodies

Title (de)

Eisenbahntransporteinheit für den gemischten Transport von Containern und Wechselbehältern

Title (fr)

Unité de transport ferroviaire pour le transport mixte de conteneurs et de caisses mobiles

Publication

EP 0727338 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101949 A

Priority

DE 19505192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727338A2] The unit consists of two length-adjustable double-axle waggons. Each waggon has front bogie sections, and container locking bolts (4), e.g. for a 40' container (1) and two at least (22') swap bodies (2). The waggon length (15) is smaller than the overall length of the two swap bodies, and is determined by the distance between the two outer corner fittings (3) of the bodies. The distance thus created between two individual waggons (5), and further distances created by the combination of other containers and bodies, is bridged by long coupling rods (6). These are length-adjustable, or rods of different length may be used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 3/20; B61G 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/20 (2006.01); B61G 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/02 (2013.01); B61D 3/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727338 A2 19960821; EP 0727338 A3 19971105; EP 0727338 B1 20020918; AT 224314 T 20021015; CZ 292355 B6 20030917; CZ 9600400 A3 19960911; DE 19505192 C1 19960829; PL 179934 B1 20001130; PL 312813 A1 19960819; SK 18696 A3 19961001; SK 283804 B6 20040203

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2007-02-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050211

2004-02-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI SE

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224314 T 20021015

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000331

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI SE

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970102

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI SE