Global Patent Index - EP 0727500 B1

EP 0727500 B1 2000-04-19 - Method and installation for producing metal ingots

Title (en)

Method and installation for producing metal ingots

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zum Herstellen von Blöcken aus Metallen

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour la fabrication de lingots métalliques

Publication

EP 0727500 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101016 A

Priority

DE 19505743 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727500A1] Metal blocks, in particular, those of steel and alloys on nickel and cobalt basis, are produced by melting of self-consuming electrodes under an electrically conductive slag in an atmosphere of controlled composition. Melting of the electrode takes place in a gas-tight space bounded by the slag bath surface, the wall of a mould (20), and a mould hood (24). Electrode change takes place by removing the hood (24) from the mould and replacing it with another hood (24a). The electrode rod (26) has a gas-tight fit with the hood opening (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 23/10 (2006.01); C21C 5/52 (2006.01); C22B 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727500 A1 19960821; EP 0727500 B1 20000419; AT 191936 T 20000515; DE 19505743 A1 19960822; JP 3958384 B2 20070815; JP H08243725 A 19960924; US 5810904 A 19980922

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140126

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604978

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-09-23 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604978

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604978 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191936 T 20000515

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981126

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960905

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE