Global Patent Index - EP 0727517 B1

EP 0727517 B1 2000-04-12 - Process for manufacturing bonded non-woven material, bonded non-woven material made by this process and use thereof

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing bonded non-woven material, bonded non-woven material made by this process and use thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines verfestigten Faservlieses, verfestigtes Faservlies nach dieser Herstellungsart und Verwendung dieses Vlieses

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'une nappe non-tissée consolidée, und nappe non-tissée consolidée obtenue par ce procédé et son utilisation

Publication

EP 0727517 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100302 A

Priority

DE 19500669 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727517A1] A process is claimed for consolidating a fibre web made of synthetic staple fibres, e.g. polyester, polyethylene or polypropylene fibres, or of continuous fibres that are up to 10 mm thick and consist of pure man-made fibres without binding fibres or special melt fibres. The web is consolidated by means of a single water needling process at a water pressure of no more than 60 bar, pref. 20-30 bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/53 (2006.01); B01D 39/16 (2006.01); D01F 8/00 (2006.01); D04H 1/492 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/492 (2013.01); D04H 1/74 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727517 A1 19960821; EP 0727517 B1 20000412; JP H08232147 A 19960910

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100111

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090111

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090111

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080109

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604929 20000518

2000-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971120

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960827

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT