Global Patent Index - EP 0727527 B1

EP 0727527 B1 2000-08-23 - Sweeping device for utility vehicle

Title (en)

Sweeping device for utility vehicle

Title (de)

Kehrvorrichtung für Arbeitsfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de balayage pour véhicule utilitaire

Publication

EP 0727527 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102227 A

Priority

DE 29502694 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2169688C] Sweeping devices for utility vehicles with a rotatingly driven bristle roller have been known, which are covered on the top side by a protective housing and in front of which a feed screw extending in parallel to the bristle roller is arranged, and the feed screw is arranged, drivable by a motor, in a sweepings collection housing, which is provided with a rear charging opening and with a discharge opening at the end of the screw, wherein the sweepings collection housing has an obliquely downwardly directed baffle plate with a flexible bottom plate under its charging opening. To improve the mode of operation and the sweeping performance, especially at higher speeds of travel, the bristle roller is driven at such a speed of rotation that in the area located between it and the charging opening of the sweepings collection housing, it generates an air flow, which continues into the discharge opening of the sweepings collection housing, which is designed as a feed cup and a flow channel at the same time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 1/04; E01H 5/06; E01H 5/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/08 (2006.01); E01H 1/04 (2006.01); E01H 5/06 (2006.01); E01H 5/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 5/06 (2013.01); E01H 1/042 (2013.01); E01H 5/092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29502694 U1 19950511; AT 195777 T 20000915; CA 2169688 A1 19960819; CA 2169688 C 20000425; EP 0727527 A1 19960821; EP 0727527 B1 20000823; JP H08253918 A 19961001; US 5742967 A 19980428

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040215

2003-02-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GIESSLER MATTHIAS

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO EDER AG

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000823

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-01-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605769 20000928

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195777 T 20000915

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991227

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970220

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL