Global Patent Index - EP 0727543 B1

EP 0727543 B1 2000-05-03 - Roof cover plate with lead-through

Title (en)

Roof cover plate with lead-through

Title (de)

Dacheindeckungsplatte mit Dachdurchführung

Title (fr)

Panneau de couverture à traversée de toit

Publication

EP 0727543 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104947 A

Priority

  • DE 9304151 U
  • EP 94908338 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9421872A1] The invention relates to a roof cover plate (1) with a lead-through in the form of an adjustable-inclination pipe (2) reaching from the underside of the roof cover plate (1) to above it. The suitable dimensioned through-hole (3) has an upper side in the form of a cupola in the region of the apex of a dome (4) and the pipe (2) has a suitably shaped cover section (5). The superimposition of the cover section (5) on the dome (4) is secured by a support for the pipe (2) on the roof cover plate (1) in the region of the underside of the latter and the pipe (2) is in two parts with a coupling point between the parts arranged in such a way that it is possible to clamp the superimposition of the cover section (5) and the dome (4); to incorporate the articulating dome (4) in a support ensuring a given angled position, it is proposed that the support is provided by a collar (K) on one pipe section (2') which bears on the underside of the dome (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1471 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 9304151 U1 19940728; AT 146841 T 19970115; AT 192529 T 20000515; AU 6141594 A 19941011; EP 0689631 A1 19960103; EP 0689631 B1 19961227; EP 0727543 A1 19960821; EP 0727543 B1 20000503; WO 9421872 A1 19940929

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021006

2002-12-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KLOBER JOHANNES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-02-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020218

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HAUSPROFI BAUSYSTEME GMBH

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HAUSPROFI BAUSYSTEME GMBH

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-15 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20010115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-12-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409328 20000608

2000-05-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 689631

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR LU NL

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192529 T 20000515

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980728

1996-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960710

1996-08-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 689631

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR LU NL