Global Patent Index - EP 0727573 B1

EP 0727573 B1 2000-04-26 - Method for heating a throttle valve body and intake air passage for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for heating a throttle valve body and intake air passage for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beheizung eines Drosselklappenstutzens und Saugrohr für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de chauffage d'un corps de papillon et tubulure d'aspiration pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0727573 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101499 A

Priority

DE 19505407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727573A1] In the inlet manifold (10) the throttle flap (12) is pivotable about its axis (14) by an electric motor (16) supplied with current via wires (24) from a controller (18). Heat losses in the motor are increased by a sequence of pulses at such a high repetition rate that it cannot react mechanically. The heating is limited by a signal to the controller from a temp. sensor in the immediate vicinity of the motor, measuring e.g. the resistance of its winding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/10; F02D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 31/135 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/1035 (2013.01); F02D 11/10 (2013.01); F02M 35/10268 (2013.01); F02M 35/1038 (2013.01); F02D 2011/102 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727573 A1 19960821; EP 0727573 B1 20000426; DE 19505407 A1 19960822; ES 2145333 T3 20000701; JP H08240130 A 19960917; US 5680850 A 19971028

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-09-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605013

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145333 T3

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605013 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-11-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980925

1996-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960705

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE