Global Patent Index - EP 0727576 B1

EP 0727576 B1 2000-05-17 - Process for detecting error conditions in diesel injection devices

Title (en)

Process for detecting error conditions in diesel injection devices

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Ermitteln von Fehlerzuständen von Dieseleinspritzanlagen

Title (fr)

Procédé de détection de conditions d'erreur de dispositifs d'injection diesel

Publication

EP 0727576 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95120213 A

Priority

DE 19505786 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727576A1] The waveforms of pressure at the injectors (1.1a-1.1d) of the four cylinders are detected e.g. by piezoelectric transducers clamped to the injection lines close to the nozzles. The detected waveform for each individual injector is normalised w.r.t. a standard curve and evaluated by comparison. Cross-correlation is performed between discrete values of the waveform sampled at regular intervals. Temporally matched individual injections are extracted from maxima of the cross-correlation function, and matched in terms of amplitude to the standard curve by linear regression.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727576 A1 19960821; EP 0727576 B1 20000517; CN 1061737 C 20010207; CN 1135575 A 19961113; DE 19505786 A1 19960822

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131220

2015-12-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59508353

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131220

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131220

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508353 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980525

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970221

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT