Global patent index - EP 0727614 B1

EP 0727614 B1 2000-01-12 - Mounting assembly for pilot burner comprising a gas nozzle, an ignition electrode and/or a flame sensor

Title (en)

Mounting assembly for pilot burner comprising a gas nozzle, an ignition electrode and/or a flame sensor

Title (de)

Haltevorrichtung für Gasdüse, Zündelektrode und/oder Flammenfühler eines Zündbrenners

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support pour buse à gaz, électrode d'allumage et/ou détecteur de flamme d'un brûleur pilote

Publication

EP 0727614 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102061 A

Priority

DE 19505218 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19505218C1] The support holder for the gas nozzle (3), electrode (2) and/or flame sensor (1) is a single U-shaped spring plate (5) whose centre web (6) is fixed on a frame and whose two arms (13,14,15) have opposing openings (9,10,11,16,17,18) for passing through at least two of the components (1,2,3). Each of the cylindrical components has a stop collar (22,23,24) for support against one arm after passing through the opening in the other arm. One arm is divided into at least two tongues (13,14,15) and at least one tongue is angled away from the centre web by an angle other than 90 deg. so that the edge of the through opening adjoining the component resiliently tensions the component with the support holder (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19505218 C1 19951221; EP 0727614 A2 19960821; EP 0727614 A3 19980218; EP 0727614 B1 20000112

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070213

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060109

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070213

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060109

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060109

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020131

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604143

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990622

1998-04-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980223

1998-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL