Global Patent Index - EP 0727617 B1

EP 0727617 B1 2000-07-19 - Built in kitchen-range with a stand-alone cooker hob

Title (en)

Built in kitchen-range with a stand-alone cooker hob

Title (de)

Einbauherd mit eigenständiger Kochmulde

Title (fr)

Fourneau de cuisine avec une table de cuisson autonome

Publication

EP 0727617 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101928 A

Priority

DE 29502768 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727617A2] The stove (1) has radiant heating elements (3) under a glass-ceramic plate (2), with control knobs (5) acting on power regulators (4) which are coupled by rods (6) to plastic joints (7) on electronic control boxes (8). Signals are conveyed by multicore cables (9) to an electronic indicator panel (10) with seven-segment displays. The rods are strengthened against torsion but elastically deformable in the lateral direction. They are centred loosely in holes (11) through a sheet-metal wall (12) in front of the control boxes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/04; F24C 7/08; F24C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29502768 U1 19950406; EP 0727617 A2 19960821; EP 0727617 A3 19970528; EP 0727617 B1 20000719; ES 2150029 T3 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080209

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-02-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040209

2004-02-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-01-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150029 T3

2000-09-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605611 20000824

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990923

1998-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971020

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT