Global Patent Index - EP 0727620 B1

EP 0727620 B1 2000-07-19 - Smoke extracting hood

Title (en)

Smoke extracting hood

Title (de)

Dunstabzugshaube

Title (fr)

Hotte aspirante pour buée

Publication

EP 0727620 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101929 A

Priority

DE 19505683 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727620A2] The fume hood extracts from the space (4) above a cooker by a fan (3) driven by an electric motor. Particles of grease and dirt are trapped by a filter (6) above a drawer (8) contg. a prefilter (9) and a flat duct (10). The sensor (12) within the duct comprises a piezoelectric vibrator (17) on one sidewall and a retroreflector (16) on the other. A screen (18) with a circular aperture (19) midway between them has flanks inclined pref. at 35 degrees so that only a narrow beam is retroreflected to the vibrator which acts also as a detector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/2092 (2013.01); F24C 15/2021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727620 A2 19960821; EP 0727620 A3 19970312; EP 0727620 B1 20000719; DE 19505683 A1 19960822

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605613

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080209

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-12-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-09-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605613 20000824

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-07-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990923

1998-07-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970905

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE