Global Patent Index - EP 0727793 B1

EP 0727793 B1 2000-05-10 - Insulating tape with edges, in particular for transformer, and transformer provided with such insulating tape

Title (en)

Insulating tape with edges, in particular for transformer, and transformer provided with such insulating tape

Title (de)

Isolierband mit Rändern, insbesondere für Transformator, und Tranformator mit einem solchen Isolierband

Title (fr)

Bande isolante à bords crantés et bordés, notamment pour transformateur, et transformateur comportant une telle bande isolante

Publication

EP 0727793 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400312 A

Priority

FR 9501780 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727793A1] The insulating band of material (14) has at least one of its edges cut with a series of short parallel cuts (16) made at equal intervals at right angles to the edge. An insulating ribbon (20) is applied to at least one surface and preferably two along the edge where the cuts are made. The insulating ribbon covers the slots. The insulating ribbon is able to stretch. As the band is wrapped around the windings of a transformer, the notched edge(s) is/are able to fold up the side flanges of the transformer, ensuring a complete covering for the windings beneath. The insulating ribbon stretches to allow the notched section to open out.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/324 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727793 A1 19960821; EP 0727793 B1 20000510; DE 69608151 D1 20000615; DE 69608151 T2 20000928; ES 2146845 T3 20000816; FR 2730848 A1 19960823; FR 2730848 B1 19970425

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110216

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND FRANCE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND SNC

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100215

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100215

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100215

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: LEGRAND FRANCE

2008-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: LEGRAND SNC

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LEGRAND SNC

- Free text: LEGRAND SNC#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE DE TASSIGNY#F-87045 LIMOGES (FR) $ LEGRAND FRANCE#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE-DE-TASSIGNY#87000 LIMOGES (FR) -TRANSFER TO- LEGRAND SNC#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE DE TASSIGNY#F-87045 LIMOGES (FR) $ LEGRAND FRANCE#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE-DE-TASSIGNY#87000 LIMOGES (FR)

2006-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LEGRAND SNC

- Free text: LEGRAND#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE DE TASSIGNY#F-87045 LIMOGES CEDEX (FR) $ LEGRAND SNC#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE DE TASSIGNY#F-87045 LIMOGES (FR) -TRANSFER TO- LEGRAND SNC#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE DE TASSIGNY#F-87045 LIMOGES (FR) $ LEGRAND FRANCE#128, AVENUE DU MARECHAL DE LATTRE-DE-TASSIGNY#87000 LIMOGES (FR)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146845 T3

2000-07-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608151 20000615

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEGRAND

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEGRAND SNC

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990422

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960911

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL