Global Patent Index - EP 0727809 B1

EP 0727809 B1 2000-05-31 - Fluorescent lamp with end of life arc quenching structure

Title (en)

Fluorescent lamp with end of life arc quenching structure

Title (de)

Fluoreszenzlampe mit einer Vorrichtung zur Bogenlöschung am Ende der Lebensdauer

Title (fr)

Lampe fluorescente avec structure d'extinction d'arc en fin de vie

Publication

EP 0727809 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96102374 A

Priority

  • EP 96102374 A
  • US 38999595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0727809A2] A fluorescent lamp comprises a glass tube, an electrode at each end of the tube, a pair of lead wires extending through each sealed end of the tube and joined to one of the electrodes, and a deposit of metal hydride-containing paste disposed in the tube and having a decomposition temperature higher than temperatures within the tube during normal operation of the lamp. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/00; H01J 61/02; H01J 61/70; H01J 61/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/02 (2006.01); H01J 61/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/02 (2013.01); H01J 61/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0727809 A2 19960821; EP 0727809 A3 19970205; EP 0727809 B1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120216

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608586

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110316

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100216

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608586 20000706

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980909

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970804

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE