Global Patent Index - EP 0727846 B1

EP 0727846 B1 2001-01-24 - LEVER TYPE CONNECTOR

Title (en)

LEVER TYPE CONNECTOR

Title (de)

HEBELSTECKVERBINDER

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR DU TYPE A LEVIER

Publication

EP 0727846 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94931691 A

Priority

  • JP 9401873 W
  • JP 6428693 U
  • JP 6475893 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9512906A1] Temporarily fitting retaining projections (35) and (35) are formed in the cam groove (33) of the arm section (32) of a lever (30). When a male connector housing (10) is lightly inserted into the hood section (21) of a female connector housing (20) in a temporarily fitting state, come-off of an engaging pin (12) from the groove (33) is inhibited. Therefore, the lever (30) can be smoothly turned. Since no hole for communication of the inside of the hood section (21) with the outside exists in the interior of the hood section (21), there is no danger of entrance of water into the interior of the section (21). Therefore, entrance of water into the interior of the hood section (21) of the female connector housing (20) can be prevented.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62933 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9512906 A1 19950511; DE 69426631 D1 20010301; DE 69426631 T2 20010523; EP 0727846 A1 19960821; EP 0727846 A4 19970827; EP 0727846 B1 20010124; US 5904583 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69426631

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091107

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091107

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081105

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426631

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-01

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981030

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981030

1997-08-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19970704

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960531

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB