Global Patent Index - EP 0728031 A4

EP 0728031 A4 2000-01-19 - GAMING TABLE APPARATUS

Title (en)

GAMING TABLE APPARATUS

Title (de)

SPIELAPPARAT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR TABLE DE JEU

Publication

EP 0728031 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 93903010 A

Priority

US 9300135 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 9/00; G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0728031 A1 19960828; EP 0728031 A4 20000119

INPADOC legal status


2000-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 19990201

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES IT

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63F 9/00 A, 7G 07F 17/32 B

1997-04-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JONES, DANIEL A.

1997-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROGRESSIVE GAMES, INC

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940630

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES IT