Global Patent Index - EP 0728437 B1

EP 0728437 B1 2001-05-02 - A recess-mountable electric household appliance with concealed actuation of an electromechanic programmer

Title (en)

A recess-mountable electric household appliance with concealed actuation of an electromechanic programmer

Title (de)

Elektrisches Einbauküchengerät mit verdeckter Betätigung der elektromechanischen Programmiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine domestique électrique encastrée avec un dispositif d'action de type masqué pour un programmateur électromécanique

Publication

EP 0728437 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202335 A

Priority

IT MI950119 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0728437A1] A recessed-mount dishwasher or household electric appliance with an electromechanical programmer installed in the loading door (1) and a disk-shaped programmer control knob (9) received on the door (1) inside and accessible, for its manual operation, through an opening (10), in the top edge (4) or a side edge of the door, which exposes a first sector of a peripheral cylindrical annulus (12) of the knob (9), a second sector of the cylindrical annulus (12), different from the first, being visible, with the door (1) half-opened, through a window (13) formed in the top edge (4) of the door. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; D06F 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 15/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4293 (2013.01); A47L 15/4257 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0728437 A1 19960828; EP 0728437 B1 20010502; DE 69520821 D1 20010607; DE 69520821 T2 20010927; IT 236683 Y1 20000817; IT MI950119 U1 19960826; IT MI950119 V0 19950224

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070829

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2006-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520821 20010607

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-08-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A RECESS-MOUNTABLE ELECTRIC HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH CONCEALED ACTUATION OF AN ELECTROMECHANIC PROGRAMMER

1997-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970925

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961005

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT