Global Patent Index - EP 0728438 B1

EP 0728438 B1 2000-05-03 - Door locking device for washing machines

Title (en)

Door locking device for washing machines

Title (de)

Türverschlussvorrichtung für Waschmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture de porte pour machines à laver

Publication

EP 0728438 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96102225 A

Priority

IT PN950012 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0728438A1] Door locking device for washing machines, in particular dish-washing machines for industrial use, comprising a single component part mounted in correspondence of the door (6) of these machines, constituted by a switch (29) acting on the machine electric circuit, a shaped nib (19) and a feeler pin element (20) co-operating with the switch (29), pivoted on the nib (19). Such feeler pin element (20) can be moved by the door movement from a lowered to a raised position thereof, when the door is respectively open or closed with respect to the machine, by causing the switch (29) to be respectively actuated on the switched off or on condition thereof. Device of simple and useful type and with easy mounting. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4259 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0728438 A1 19960828; EP 0728438 B1 20000503; DE 69608009 D1 20000608; DE 69608009 T2 20001116; ES 2147318 T3 20000901; IT 238838 Y1 20001115; IT PN950012 U1 19960822; IT PN950012 V0 19950222; PT 728438 E 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090216

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090216

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-08-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090817

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080310

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147318 T3

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608009 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR PT

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980703

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970224

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR PT