Global patent index - EP 0728540 B1

EP 0728540 B1 2000-06-14 - Tool for shaping sheet metal

Title (en)

Tool for shaping sheet metal

Title (de)

Werkzeug zur Blechumformung

Title (fr)

Outil pour le formage de tôle

Publication

EP 0728540 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101769 A

Priority

DE 19506391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0728540A2] The single stage method involves shaping rollers (19) which can turn are fitted to the lower part of the tool. When the two halves of the tool are brought together, the upper part acts as a punch. The shaping rollers have teeth (15) part of the way round them. A first toothed rod is fitted across the axis of one of the shaping rolls. Its teeth are engaged with those (15) of this roll to drive it, i.e. the translational motion of the toothed rod is transformed into rotation of the shaping roll.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 15/02; B21D 53/28; B21D 53/84; B21H 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 15/02 (2006.01); B21D 53/28 (2006.01); B21H 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/28 (2013.01); B21D 15/02 (2013.01); B21H 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0728540 A2 19960828; EP 0728540 A3 19970827; EP 0728540 B1 20000614; DE 19506391 A1 19960905; DE 19506391 B4 20100107; ES 2146799 T3 20000816

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59605420

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150818

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605420

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100208

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110314

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100207

2011-03-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110328

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101029

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-06-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO TECNICO ING. A. MANNUCCI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146799

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALLGAIER-WERKE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605420

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990422

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971015

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT