Global Patent Index - EP 0728623 B1

EP 0728623 B1 2000-05-17 - Method for controlling the transmission of messages on a transmission network in an automobile's on-board electronic system

Title (en)

Method for controlling the transmission of messages on a transmission network in an automobile's on-board electronic system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung der Übertragung von Nachrichten im Übertragungsnetzwerk eines elektronischen Bordsystems eines Automobils

Title (fr)

Procédé de gestion de la transmission de messages sur un réseau de transmission d'un système électronique embarqué à bord d'un véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0728623 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400200 A

Priority

FR 9501997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0728623A1] This procedure manages the cyclical and sporadic message transmission of a multiplex master-slave system transmitting information between electronic system stations. The electronic system is mounted on the automobile vehicle side. The cyclical messages are classified by category as a function of their emission period on the system, either having a base period or multiples of this. Successive transmission time sections (4,5,6) are defined, corresponding to base periods. Of two successive spaces (7,8), the first (7) defines cyclical messages of different total or partial categories as function of emission period and space duration. The second (8) defines sporadic message transmission. Successive areas (9,10) of the first space may be defined for cyclical message transmission as function of their emission period.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 16/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/02 (2006.01); B60R 16/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/0315 (2013.01); B60R 2016/0322 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0728623 A1 19960828; EP 0728623 B1 20000517; DE 69608331 D1 20000621; DE 69608331 T2 20000921; FR 2730834 A1 19960823; FR 2730834 B1 19970430

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050126

2003-09-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030126

2002-01-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000815

2000-07-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608331 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980917

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960726

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT