Global Patent Index - EP 0728695 B1

EP 0728695 B1 2001-04-04 - DEVICE FOR EXTENDING AND STORING HORIZONTAL BOOM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR EXTENDING AND STORING HORIZONTAL BOOM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSSCHIEBEN UND AUSLAGERN VON EINEM HORIZONTALEN AUSLEGER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'EXTENSION ET DE STOCKAGE D'UNE FLECHE HORIZONTALE

Publication

EP 0728695 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94931694 A

Priority

  • JP 9401876 W
  • JP 30227093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9513240A1] The invention relates to a device for extending and storing a horizontal boom, said apparatus enabling turning of the horizontal boom to a side surface of a vertical boom for storing in parallel with the latter, and easy extending of the same. Therefore, pin bores (6) are formed in brackets (5) secured to a tip end of the vertical boom (2), brackets (11) are secured to a support frame (10) mounted to the horizontal boom (3), pin bores (12) are formed longitudinally of the brackets (11), the pin bores (6) and the pin bores (12) are turnably connected to each other by connection pins (14), and a turning drive device (16) is provided on a center line of the connection pins (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/26; B66C 23/42; B66C 23/68; B66C 23/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/26 (2006.01); B66C 23/42 (2006.01); B66C 23/68 (2006.01); B66C 23/687 (2006.01); B66C 23/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/68 (2013.01); B66C 23/42 (2013.01); B66C 23/702 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9513240 A1 19950518; CN 1038574 C 19980603; CN 1136798 A 19961127; DE 69427033 D1 20010510; DE 69427033 T2 20011025; EP 0728695 A1 19960828; EP 0728695 A4 19970604; EP 0728695 B1 20010404; JP 3258472 B2 20020218; JP H07125986 A 19950516; TW 298901 U 19970221

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011108

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427033 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990906

1997-06-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19970415

1997-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960523

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB