Global Patent Index - EP 0728824 B1

EP 0728824 B1 2000-08-23 - Self-adhesive tape

Title (en)

Self-adhesive tape

Title (de)

Selbsklebeband

Title (fr)

Ruban auto-adhésif

Publication

EP 0728824 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101631 A

Priority

DE 19506250 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0728824A1] Pressure-sensitive self-adhesive tape has a substrate of all-purpose rubber with a pressure-sensitive adhesive coating on both sides. Pref. the substrate consists of natural rubber. It may contain additive(s) e.g. antioxidant, crosslinker, photostabiliser, antiozonant, fatty acid, resin, plasticiser and accelerator, adhesion promoter and/or filler(s) e.g. C black, ZnO, solid microspheres, SiO2, silicates and CaCO3. It may also be chemically or physically crosslinked.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09J 7/02; B60R 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 10/00 (2006.01); B60R 13/02 (2006.01); C09J 7/02 (2006.01); C09J 11/04 (2006.01); C09J 201/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 13/02 (2013.01); B60J 10/35 (2016.02); C09J 7/0246 (2013.01); C09J 7/0271 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249983 (2015.04); Y10T 428/2848 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0728824 A1 19960828; EP 0728824 B1 20000823; DE 19603919 A1 19960829; ES 2150605 T3 20001201; JP H08245933 A 19960924; US 5688589 A 19971118

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040207

2005-02-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050206

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040206

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040207

2004-02-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040206

2003-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-04-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150605 T3

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-10-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605770 20000928

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961126

1997-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961126

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960704

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT