Global Patent Index - EP 0728883 B1

EP 0728883 B1 2000-09-06 - Supporting anchor for façade plates

Title (en)

Supporting anchor for façade plates

Title (de)

Traganker für Fassadenplatten

Title (fr)

Ancre porteuse pour des plaques de façade

Publication

EP 0728883 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102170 A

Priority

DE 19506023 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0728883A1] The horizontally displaceable wedge plate (14) supports the anchor body (4) in a vertical alignment. The wedge plate has an inclinedly rising wedge slot (15), through which the screw (7) extends. The wedge plate is so fitted in the anchor body that guide components of the anchor body engage over a guide profile (16,17) of it and the wedge plate cannot be released backwards out of the anchor body. The wedge plate has upper and lower edge strips inclinedly edged to the anchor body, which forms the guide profile and are guided in opposed guide grooves (18,19) of the anchor body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0855 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Prospekt "Traganker System 3", Lutz Ankersysteme GmbH & Co KG, Wetheim, 10.1991, S. 1-12

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0728883 A1 19960828; EP 0728883 B1 20000906; AT 196176 T 20000915; CZ 290770 B6 20021016; CZ 9600511 A3 19970312; DE 19506023 A1 19960905; DE 19506023 C2 19970710

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605834

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LUTZ ANKERSYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605834 20001012

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI NL

2000-09-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196176 T 20000915

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981211

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981211

1996-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960925

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI NL