Global Patent Index - EP 0728885 B1

EP 0728885 B1 2000-05-03 - Handle unit for a motor vehicle door

Title (en)

Handle unit for a motor vehicle door

Title (de)

Griffeinheit für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Unité de poignée pour une portière

Publication

EP 0728885 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100944 A

Priority

DE 19506667 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0728885A2] The handle (1) is contained in a housing (2), and has a protrusion (14) on the inside engaging with an actuating mechanism (8) coupled to the lock release lever. The slide (4) on the inside of the panel (12) has a lever (5) attached to it, and which couples the protrusion to the mechanism on movement of the slide. There can be an opening (13) in the latter and through which the bolt-type protrusion passes, together with part of the housing which forms the lock cylinder (19). The slide can be clamped against the panel inside surface on movement of the handle. The lever can be stirrup-shaped, enclosing the protrusion which passes through the panel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 3/00; E05B 7/00; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05B 79/20 (2014.01); E05B 85/10 (2014.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/10 (2013.01); E05B 17/0004 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0728885 A2 19960828; EP 0728885 A3 19970205; EP 0728885 B1 20000503; DE 19506667 A1 19960829; ES 2148601 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070124

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060124

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-01-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060124

2005-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050107

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148601 T3

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605087 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990223

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970606

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT