Global Patent Index - EP 0728946 B1

EP 0728946 B1 2000-04-05 - Improvement in the lubricating system for a hermetically sealed reciprocating compressor

Title (en)

Improvement in the lubricating system for a hermetically sealed reciprocating compressor

Title (de)

Schmierungsvorrichtung für einen hermetischen Kolbenverdichter

Title (fr)

Système de lubrification pour un compresseur hermétique à mouvement alternatif

Publication

EP 0728946 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96100810 A

Priority

IT PN950014 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0728946A1] The compressor comprises a hermetically sealed casing (7) in which a piston (8) is operable by a rotating shaft (9) an end portion of which rotatably drives pumping means adapted to supply a lubrication system of the compressor with lubricant oil from an oil bath (13) contained in the casing. The pumping means comprise a helical-screw rotor (14) which is coupled by snap-fitting to said rotating means (9) and combines with an adjacent coaxial stator (15) to define a pumping chamber (16) dipped in said oil bath (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/0261 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0728946 A1 19960828; EP 0728946 B1 20000405; DE 69607508 D1 20000511; DE 69607508 T2 20010111; IT 238840 Y1 20001115; IT PN950014 U1 19960823; IT PN950014 V0 19950223

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080121

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080120

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080120

2008-09-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-12-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-12-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-12-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607508 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-09-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990426

1997-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZANUSSI ELETTROMECCANICA S.P.A.

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970114

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE