Global Patent Index - EP 0729163 B1

EP 0729163 B1 2001-12-19 - Keyboard for cash registers

Title (en)

Keyboard for cash registers

Title (de)

Tastenfeld für Verkaufs- und Registrierkassen

Title (fr)

Clavier pour caisses enregistreuses

Publication

EP 0729163 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117657 A

Priority

DE 19506509 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0729163A2] The keyboard of such as a cash register is constructed using two types of push button operated keys, namely those having a long stroke Ä4Ü and those having a short stroke Ä5Ü. Both keys are of a lever Ä9Ü type that are shaped at one end to act as a pivot point and have formed stops Ä16Ü that limit the range of movement. The lever and push button are integrated into a single unit. The tips of the key levers have a switch pad Ä17Ü that engages the projection on a circuit mat Ä18Ü when the push button is operated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/00 (2006.01); H01H 13/70 (2006.01); H01H 13/705 (2006.01); H01H 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/705 (2013.01); G07G 1/0018 (2013.01); H01H 2217/008 (2013.01); H01H 2217/042 (2013.01); H01H 2221/016 (2013.01); H01H 2221/064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0729163 A2 19960828; EP 0729163 A3 19980318; EP 0729163 B1 20011219; DE 19506509 A1 19960829; DE 19506509 C2 19961205; JP H08279318 A 19961022; US 5739507 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061109

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061109

2005-11-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051109

2004-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-11-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031110

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509968 20020131

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010212

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980328

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE