Global patent index - EP 0729600 B1

EP 0729600 B1 2000-06-07 - A PRINT ENGINE PAPER FEED DEVICE

Title (en)

A PRINT ENGINE PAPER FEED DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON PAPIER AN EINE DRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D' ALIMENTATION EN PAPIER POUR APPAREIL A IMPRIMER

Publication

EP 0729600 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95902608 A

Priority

  • US 9413340 W
  • US 15223093 A
  • US 14705693 A
  • US 14127393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9514259A1] A precurl device for adjusting the curvature of the paper prior to being disposed on a transfer drum (48). The paper is fed along a path defined by a guide (296) to a nip between two precurl rollers (244) and (246). The durometer of the roller (246) is higher than the durometer of the roller (244), such that the roller (244) will deform at the nip between the rollers. The paper is fed to an attachment roller (198) that is adjacent the drum (48). A variable precurl device (312) is operable to vary the force on the roller (244) against the roller (246), to vary the amount of arcuate deformation imparted to the paper (146).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/06 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/062 (2013.01); G03G 15/1695 (2013.01); B65H 2511/17 (2013.01); B65H 2515/34 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00409 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00704 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/17 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2515/34 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/11

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9514259 A1 19950526; AU 1181895 A 19950606; DE 69424876 D1 20000713; EP 0729600 A1 19960904; EP 0729600 B1 20000607; JP H10502178 A 19980224

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-11-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-09-08 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424876

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

1999-09-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A PRINT ENGINE PAPER FEED DEVICE

1999-08-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A PRINT ENGINE PAPER FEED DEVICE

1998-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980526

1996-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960528

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT