Global Patent Index - EP 0729601 B1

EP 0729601 B1 2000-03-29 - APPARATUS TO REDUCE VOLTAGE REQUIRED TO ELECTROSTATICALLY ADHERE TRANSFER MATERIAL TO AN ARCUATE SURFACE

Title (en)

APPARATUS TO REDUCE VOLTAGE REQUIRED TO ELECTROSTATICALLY ADHERE TRANSFER MATERIAL TO AN ARCUATE SURFACE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERNIEDRIGUNG EINER SPANNUNG ZUR ELEKTROSTATISCHEN ANHAFTUNG VON EINEM MATERIAL AN EINE GEWOELBTE FLAECHE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL REDUISANT LA TENSION NECESSAIRE POUR FAIRE ADHERER ELECTROSTATIQUEMENT UNE MATIERE DE TRANSFERT SUR UNE SURFACE COURBE

Publication

EP 0729601 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95901872 A

Priority

  • US 9413040 W
  • US 15223093 A
  • US 14127393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9514260A1] A buried electrode drum (48) includes a rigid core (10) over which a controlled durometer layer (12) is disposed. On the surface of the controlled durometer layer (12) is disposed a buried electrode layer (14), having electrodes (16) disposed therein along the longitudinal axis of the drum (48). The electrode layer (14) is covered by a controlled resistivity layer (18). The controlled resistivity layer (18) is operable to be contacted on the surface thereof by an electrode (24) to allow a voltage to be transferred to the underlying electrodes (16) and therefrom along the longitudinal axis of the drum (48). Various electrodes can be disposed about the peripheral edge of the drum (48) to allow any pattern to be formed on the surface of the drum (48).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/01 (2006.01); B65H 5/06 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/6576 (2013.01); B65H 5/062 (2013.01); G03G 15/1695 (2013.01); B65H 2511/17 (2013.01); B65H 2515/34 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00409 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00662 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00704 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/17 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2515/34 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/11

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9514260 A1 19950526; AU 1095295 A 19950606; DE 69423777 D1 20000504; EP 0729601 A1 19960904; EP 0729601 B1 20000329; JP H10501896 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423777 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1998-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980605

1996-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960524

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT