Global Patent Index - EP 0729713 B1

EP 0729713 B1 2001-05-09 - STOCKINGS

Title (en)

STOCKINGS

Title (de)

STRÜMPFE

Title (fr)

BAS

Publication

EP 0729713 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95931407 A

Priority

  • JP 9501825 W
  • JP 21930294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9608172A1] In bargain stockings in which the fabrics of leg portions are knitted with elastic covering threads alone, a covering thread constituting the elastic covering threads is a convex quadrilateral elongated fiber thread of polyamide having a square horizontal cross-sectional shape (1) which has four projecting portions (4, 4') and no recessed portions, and which is formed by four outwardly bulging curved sides (5, 5') extending from the four sides of an inscribed square (3) having the projecting portions (4, 4') as its apexes. It is preferably that this thread does not substantially contain titanium oxide, has a thread fineness of 5-12 denier and 2-7 filaments, and is a single elastic covering thread or a double elastic covering thread having a covering twist number of 2200-2800 t/m. Stockings having very high or good transparency, refreshing feeling, glossiness and external appearance which could not be attained by conventional bargain stocking can be obtained, the stockings according to the present invention also having an excellent touch, a high softness, an excellent wearing feeling, excellent fitting characteristics and durability. Therefore, stockings having excellent fitting characteristics, fashionableness, agreeable feeling and high durability can be obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 11/00 (2006.01); D02G 3/32 (2006.01); D02G 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/328 (2013.01); A41B 11/00 (2013.01); D02G 3/32 (2013.01); D10B 2331/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9608172 A1 19960321; CN 1107466 C 20030507; CN 1135709 A 19961113; DE 69520874 D1 20010613; DE 69520874 T2 20011011; EP 0729713 A1 19960904; EP 0729713 A4 19970611; EP 0729713 B1 20010509

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090913

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090913

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520874 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981210

1997-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960603

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB