Global Patent Index - EP 0729719 B1

EP 0729719 B1 2001-04-04 - Device for applying a pasty product, in particular a cosmetic product such as lipstick

Title (en)

Device for applying a pasty product, in particular a cosmetic product such as lipstick

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auftragen eines pastösen Produktes, insbesondere eines kosmetischen Produktes wie Lippenstift

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer un produit pâteux, en particulier un produit cosmétique tel que du rouge à lèvres

Publication

EP 0729719 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96201076 A

Priority

  • EP 94402792 A
  • FR 9314969 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0658325A1] The device comprises: a tubular element (1) with a slide in which a cup (3) is slidably mounted, the said cup being intended to receive a stick (B) of product and including at least one stud (4) engaged in a slide (2); a cylindrical casing (11) in the wall of which at least one helical groove (13) is provided, this casing being slipped over the tubular element, the stud (4) being engaged in a groove (13); and an outer sleeve (14) in which the casing (11) is locked whilst the tubular element (1) can turn relative to the said casing (11) and sleeve (14). Flexible friction means (F) are provided between the casing (11) and the tubular element (1) and include at least one tongue (15), flexible in the radial direction, provided on one of the pieces and capable of interacting with an inclined bearing surface (20) provided on the other piece. The tongue (15) and the inclined bearing surface (20) are located, in the axial direction, beyond the lower end of the outer sleeve (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/00 (2006.01); A45D 40/06 (2006.01); A45D 40/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0658325 A1 19950621; EP 0658325 B1 19990421; CA 2137957 A1 19950615; CA 2137957 C 20000404; DE 69418006 D1 19990527; DE 69418006 T2 19990812; DE 69427034 D1 20010510; DE 69427034 T2 20010802; EP 0729719 A1 19960904; EP 0729719 B1 20010404; EP 0729719 B9 20011219; ES 2130378 T3 19990701; ES 2155570 T3 20010516; FR 2713455 A1 19950616; FR 2713455 B1 19960202; JP 2783516 B2 19980806; JP 2809610 B2 19981015; JP H07213336 A 19950815; JP H09346 A 19970107; US 6036387 A 20000314; US 6312179 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081206

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081209

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081209

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081206

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081206

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071210

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071205

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155570 T3

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427034 20010510

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 658325

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990219

1996-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960422

1996-09-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 658325

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT