Global Patent Index - EP 0729842 B1

EP 0729842 B1 2000-07-12 - Media handling in an ink-jet printer

Title (en)

Media handling in an ink-jet printer

Title (de)

Medientransport bei einem Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Transport de médias dans une imprimante à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0729842 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96301348 A

Priority

  • US 39680195 A
  • US 52672895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0729842A2] Described herein is a printer having a printhead (102) which traverses laterally across a sheetlike print medium (110) and which thereby defines a laterally-extending print zone across the print medium. A paper transport mechanism in the printer has drive rollers (114) and associated pinch wheels (180) to drive the print medium through the printer's print zone. The paper transport mechanism further includes an upper print media guide (202) and a lower print medium guide (126). The two print medium guides are shaped at their transverse ends to bow the transverse edges of the print medium downwardly to reduce its tendency to buckle upwardly into the printhead. In order to fit the upper print medium guide into the limited available space above the drive rollers, it is made of a lower molded portion (170) for paper contact and an upper backing portion (172) for rigidity. A pinch finger (191) extends toward the printer's print zone beyond the pinch wheels to establish a pinch point (192) against the drive roller in near proximity to the print zone. To facilitate ejection of printed pages, the upper print medium guide is formed with a series of ribs (204) which contact the paper. The ribs reduce friction and static buildup, and make it easier to push the paper from the paper transport mechanism. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/10; B41J 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/10 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/14 (2006.01); B65H 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/005 (2013.01); B41J 13/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0729842 A2 19960904; EP 0729842 A3 19980715; EP 0729842 B1 20000712; DE 69609217 D1 20000817; DE 69609217 T2 20001130; JP H09512506 A 19971216; WO 9626839 A1 19960906

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140228

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-12-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609217

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990907

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980821

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1998-07-08 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: B41J 13/10

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT