Global Patent Index - EP 0729844 B1

EP 0729844 B1 2001-01-03 - Dual inkjet pen carriage system

Title (en)

Dual inkjet pen carriage system

Title (de)

Wagensystem für zwei Farbstrahlschreiber

Title (fr)

Système de balayage pour deux dispositifs d'écriture

Publication

EP 0729844 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95307796 A

Priority

US 39924495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0729844A1] A dual pen carriage system (50) supports a pair of inkjet pens (60, 62) in an inkjet printing mechanism (20). A carriage body (75) defines a pair of pen chambers (80, 82), separated by a main alignment wall (76), for receiving the pens (60, 62). The main wall (76) defines at least one first direction alignment datum (180, 180', 182, 184; 180', 184, 186, 188) in each chamber (80, 82). A reference rod (190) extends through both chambers (80, 82) to define pen alignment datums in two orthogonal directions, which are orthogonal to the first direction. The body (75) supports an adjustment member (215) that selectively engages a rotational registration member (214) along the main wall (76) to simultaneously adjust the angular alignment of each pen chamber (80, 82). A latch mechanism (70, 72) coupled to the carriage body (75) applies, upon closing, a controlled force to a latching land (115, 155) on each pen (60, 62) to push the pens into contact with the datums (180, 180', 182, 184, 190, 196; 180', 184, 186, 188, 190, 198). A method is also provided for aligning a pair of inkjet pens (60, 62) in an inkjet printing mechanism (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 25/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/54 (2006.01); B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/05 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 25/304 (2006.01); B41J 25/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17553 (2013.01); B41J 2/1752 (2013.01); B41J 2/1755 (2013.01); B41J 25/304 (2013.01); B41J 25/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0729844 A1 19960904; EP 0729844 B1 20010103; CN 1083340 C 20020424; CN 1138527 A 19961225; DE 69519790 D1 20010208; DE 69519790 T2 20010419; DE 69529779 D1 20030403; DE 69529779 T2 20031127; DE 69534328 D1 20050825; DE 69534328 T2 20060504; EP 1018436 A2 20000712; EP 1018436 A3 20001122; EP 1018436 B1 20030226; EP 1234679 A2 20020828; EP 1234679 A3 20021127; EP 1234679 B1 20050720; JP 3856864 B2 20061213; JP H08244230 A 19960924; KR 100402568 B1 20040309

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-05-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-03-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519790 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHRISTIANSON, JOHN A.

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLEY, RICHARD A.

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARMON, JOHN PAUL

1998-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980309

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970214

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT