Global patent index - EP 0729846 B1

EP 0729846 B1 2000-01-12 - Printed reference image compensation

Title (en)

Printed reference image compensation

Title (de)

Bildkompensation mittels gedruckter Referenzmarken

Title (fr)

Compensation d'image au moyen de marques de référence imprimées

Publication

EP 0729846 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96301419 A

Priority

US 39776795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0729846A2] The present invention provides for controlling image registration of images printed on a substrate of an ink jet web press. Registration marks are printed on the substrate, relative to the print location of the images, and then read. The registration marks are used to determine spatial discrepancies in subsequent images. Dynamic corrections correct for spatial discrepancies in subsequent images to assure good overlay of image data onto previously printed images, and static corrections correct for spatial discrepancies in alignment of subsequent printheads to each other to assure good reference of image data onto previously printed images. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 25/34; B41J 11/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0729846 A2 19960904; EP 0729846 A3 19980603; EP 0729846 B1 20000112; DE 69606076 D1 20000217; DE 69606076 T2 20000831

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-02-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060221

2005-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050302

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050207

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PIATT, MICHAEL J.

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STADUM, RODNEY J.

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TANK, PETER N.

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990507

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960911

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB