Global Patent Index - EP 0730068 B1

EP 0730068 B1 2002-09-18 - Skylight

Title (en)

Skylight

Title (de)

Dachflächenfenster

Title (fr)

Lucarne

Publication

EP 0730068 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103046 A

Priority

AT 36895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0730068A1] The window has a casement which is mounted in a frame, so that it can swing about an axis. The frame has at least one moulding (6) with a drainage surface (18) which leads out at an angle from the region of the groove (12) between the casement and the frame. When the window is installed, the drainage surface on the lower moulding of the frame may fall away outwards with respect to the horizontal (h). The angle of fall may be at least 1 degree, and may be preferably between 2 and 5 degrees. It may also make an angle of 45 degrees or less with the plane of the closed window, and this may be preferably less than 30 degrees.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/035; E06B 3/26; E06B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/035 (2006.01); E06B 3/263 (2006.01); E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/325 (2013.01); E04D 13/0354 (2013.01); E06B 3/26303 (2013.01); E06B 3/308 (2013.01); E06B 7/14 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26383 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0730068 A1 19960904; EP 0730068 B1 20020918; AT 403827 B 19980525; AT A36895 A 19971015; DE 59609663 D1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609663 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990913

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970218

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB