Global Patent Index - EP 0730091 B1

EP 0730091 B1 2000-02-09 - Fuel injection valve for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de combustible pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0730091 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117473 A

Priority

DE 19502915 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0730091A2] The valve closure ball (8) is lifted from its seating (9) so that a stream (15) of fuel is directed through a metering aperture (12) in an injector plate (13) towards the deflector (22). The angled deflecting surface (21) features on its axis of symmetry (25) a recess (26) from which two grooves (27) diverge. The shape of the recess and grooves determines the number and direction of the jets (14) of fuel entering the combustion chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18; F02M 57/00; F02M 61/16; F02M 69/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 69/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/188 (2013.01); F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01); F02M 61/1853 (2013.01); F02M 69/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19502915 A1 19960801; CN 1066803 C 20010606; CN 1136134 A 19961120; EP 0730091 A2 19960904; EP 0730091 A3 19961002; EP 0730091 B1 20000209; JP H08232815 A 19960910; US 5725158 A 19980310

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-06-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-11-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021023

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507788 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980928

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970402

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB