Global Patent Index - EP 0730135 B1

EP 0730135 B1 2000-09-20 - Trigger mechanism for hammerless fire arms

Title (en)

Trigger mechanism for hammerless fire arms

Title (de)

Abzugseinrichtung für hammerlose Schusswaffen

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de détente pour armes à feu sans chien

Publication

EP 0730135 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102050 A

Priority

DE 19507052 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0730135A1] The equipment operates in conjunction with the spring-loaded bolt (2) of a gun, especially a self-loading pistol, which does not have a hammer. The bolt can move axially and combines with a trigger bar (10) to provide a double-action function, in which more than one round is discharged. At least one switchable interconnecting member is arranged between the bar and the bolt, in order to provide a single-action function, in which only one round is discharged. The switching action may take place automatically during the firing sequence, and may also involve the addition or removal of interconnecting members.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 19/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/00 (2006.01); F41A 19/35 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/35 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0730135 A1 19960904; EP 0730135 B1 20000920; AT 196543 T 20001015; CZ 292572 B6 20031015; CZ 9600443 A3 19960911; DE 19507052 A1 19960905; US 5701698 A 19971230

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605899

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100213

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CARL *WALTHER G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100228

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070213

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: WERNER FENNER PATENTANWALT;HOFACHER 1;5425 SCHNEISINGEN (CH)

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WERNER FENNER PATENTANWALT

2001-02-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605899

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-26

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196543

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970709

1997-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970709

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970204

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI