Global Patent Index - EP 0730419 B1

EP 0730419 B1 2001-04-04 - CONFERENCE CABINETS

Title (en)

CONFERENCE CABINETS

Title (de)

KONFERENZGESTELL

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE PRESENTATION POUR CONFERENCE

Publication

EP 0730419 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95902368 A

Priority

  • SE 9401107 W
  • SE 9303878 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9514406A1] A conference cabinet provided with a flip-over pad support (14) which is automatically tilted when moved from a parking position adjacent and parallel to a writing surface (10) into an outwardly turned position adjacent thereto. The tilting is achieved in that the flip-over pad support is turned around two axes (30, 32), one axis (32) nearest to the flip-over pad support being tilted relative to the vertical plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 46/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 46/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 46/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9514406 A1 19950601; DE 69427035 D1 20010510; DE 69427035 T2 20011129; EP 0730419 A1 19960911; EP 0730419 B1 20010404; SE 501145 C2 19941128; SE 9303878 D0 19931123; SE 9303878 L 19941128

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051121

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051121

2004-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041103

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427035 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

1997-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970521

1996-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960624

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB