Global Patent Index - EP 0730636 B1

EP 0730636 B1 2001-04-25 - MICROEMULSION ALL PURPOSE LIQUID CLEANING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

MICROEMULSION ALL PURPOSE LIQUID CLEANING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

MIKROEMULSION FLÜSSIGE ALLZWECKREINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS NETTOYANTES LIQUIDES POLYVALENTES EN MICROEMULSION

Publication

EP 0730636 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95904066 A

Priority

  • US 9413162 W
  • US 15534593 A
  • US 28863894 A
  • US 33693494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9514765A1] An improvement is described in microemulsion compositions more environmentally friendly, which is especially effective in the removal of oily and greasy soil and having an evidenced grease release effect, contains an anionic detergent, a partially esterfied ethoxylated polyhydric alcohol, a hydrocarbon ingredient, and water which comprises the use of a water-insoluble odoriferous perfume as the essential hydrocarbon ingredient in a proportion sufficient to form a dilute o/w microemulsion composition containing, by weight, 1 % to 20 % of an anionic detergent, 0.1 to 50 % of a cosurfactant, 0.1 to 10.0 % of a grease release agent; 0.1 % to 10 % of an ethoxylated glycerol type compound, 0.4 % to 10 % of perfume and the balance being water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 1/66; C11D 1/825

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/12 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01); C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/74 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/12 (2013.01); C11D 1/667 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01); C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/8305 (2013.01); C11D 3/2079 (2013.01); C11D 3/50 (2013.01); C11D 17/0021 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/74 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4592856 A 19860603 - KOBAYASHI TAISHI [JP], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9514765 A1 19950601; AT 200793 T 20010515; AU 1289195 A 19950613; AU 680087 B2 19970717; BR 9408122 A 19970805; CA 2177067 A1 19950601; DE 69427154 D1 20010531; DE 69427154 T2 20011129; DK 0730636 T3 20010813; EP 0730636 A1 19960911; EP 0730636 B1 20010425; ES 2158072 T3 20010901; GR 3036281 T3 20011031; NZ 277602 A 19970922; PL 314622 A1 19960916; PT 730636 E 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081118

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-06-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031213

2004-01-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031105

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-14 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *COLGATE-PALMOLIVE CY

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2002-12-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-11-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-09-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-07-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011118

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Free text: BO 01/38 PAGES: 263, IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020103

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-03 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020103

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-11-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011118

2001-11-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20011114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-09-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-09-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158072 T3

2001-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-08-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427154 20010531

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200793 T 20010515

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990430

1996-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MONDIN, MYRIAM

1996-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MISSELYN, ANNE-MARIE

1996-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAHIEU, MARIANNE

1996-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YIANAKOPOULOS, GEORGES

1996-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960621

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE